Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/30/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/04/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/10/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/09/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/10/1998