Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/03/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/03/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/03/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/03/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/03/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/03/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/09/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/14/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/28/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/28/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/28/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/28/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/28/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/06/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/06/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/20/1998