Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/25/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/25/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/25/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/25/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/25/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/25/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/25/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/25/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/25/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/25/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/05/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/05/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/11/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/11/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/11/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/17/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/17/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/17/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/17/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/17/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/08/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/14/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/14/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/14/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/14/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/17/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/21/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/21/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/21/1997