Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/31/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 08/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/04/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/04/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/05/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 08/05/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/06/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/06/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/14/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/14/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/24/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/24/1998