Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 08/03/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/07/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/07/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/09/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/09/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/10/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/20/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/20/1998