There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to provide limited authority for concurrent payment of retired pay and veterans' disability compensation for certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/14/1997Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
04/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
01/07/1997Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to House National Security
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to the Committee on National Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/19/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/03/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/16/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/09/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/09/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/31/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/12/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/26/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/29/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House National Security01/07/1997 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/14/1997 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs01/07/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.44.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.44. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

States that a prohibition on the concurrent award of veterans' disability compensation and military retired pay shall not apply to a person who has a service-connected disability if: (1) the person completed at least 20 years of retirement-creditable military service; and (2) the disability was incurred or aggravated in the line of duty and is rated at not less than 70 percent.