Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/19/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/03/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/16/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/06/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/09/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/09/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/31/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/12/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/26/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/26/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/29/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/11/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/1998