Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 08/07/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/09/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/17/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/17/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/01/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 12/17/1998