Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 08/05/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 08/05/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/07/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/09/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/09/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/09/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/09/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/11/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/15/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/15/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/17/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/17/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/18/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/24/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/25/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/05/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/05/1998