Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 08/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/23/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/26/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/01/1998