Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/09/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/14/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/18/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/18/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/24/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/24/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/24/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/26/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/26/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/29/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/29/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/29/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/29/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/01/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/01/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/07/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/08/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/09/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/13/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/14/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/19/1998