Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/14/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/15/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/29/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/01/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/07/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/09/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/14/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/19/1998