There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Savings and Investment Incentive Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage savings and investment through individual retirement accounts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/09/1997Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (140)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/21/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/06/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/06/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/11/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/11/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/11/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/11/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/11/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/25/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/27/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/18/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/18/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/20/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/08/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/16/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/16/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/09/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.446.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/1997)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Retirement Savings Incentives

Subtitle A: Restoration of IRA Deduction

Subtitle B: Nondeductible Tax-Free IRAs

Title II: Penalty-Free Distributions

Savings and Investment Incentive Act of 1997 - Title I: Retirement Savings Incentives - Subtitle A: Restoration of IRA Deduction - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the deduction for individual retirement accounts (IRAs), to increase the income limits applicable to active participants. Removes limitations on a spouse's participation.

(Sec. 102) Provides an inflation adjustment for the deductible amount.

(Sec. 103) Revises provisions concerning the allowance of certain coins and bullion as IRA investments.

Subtitle B: Nondeductible Tax-Free IRAs - Permits individuals to establish IRA Plus accounts which shall be treated similarly to an IRA plan. Prohibits deductions for contributions to such accounts. Sets forth distribution rules (including the exclusion of qualified distributions from gross income).

Title II: Penalty-Free Distributions - Permits distributions without penalty for qualified: (1) first home purchases; (2) higher education expenses; and (3) unemployed individuals.