Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/21/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/06/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/06/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/06/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/11/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/11/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/11/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/11/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/11/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/25/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/27/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/18/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/18/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/20/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/08/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/16/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/16/1997