Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 08/06/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/05/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/05/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/05/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/05/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/05/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/05/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/05/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/05/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/05/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/05/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/07/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/08/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/09/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/12/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/20/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/20/1998