Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/06/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/06/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/14/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/24/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/24/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/28/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/09/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/15/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/15/1998