Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/28/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/28/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/01/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/08/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/09/1998