Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/12/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/12/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/12/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/09/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/09/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/09/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/09/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/09/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/10/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/10/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/25/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/06/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/23/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/23/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/23/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/29/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/29/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/29/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/05/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/05/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/26/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/26/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/05/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/19/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/01/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/1998