Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/15/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/16/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/16/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/16/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/16/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/17/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/17/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/17/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/17/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/17/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/23/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/23/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/23/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/23/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/23/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/23/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/24/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/05/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/05/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/05/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/08/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/08/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/08/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/08/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew