Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/13/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/21/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/10/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/07/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/18/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/17/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/17/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/23/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/30/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/06/1998