Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/23/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/23/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/24/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/24/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/24/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/24/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/24/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/24/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/24/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/25/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/25/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/28/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/05/1998