Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/25/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/28/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/01/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/01/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/01/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/01/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/05/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/07/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/07/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/10/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/20/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/20/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/20/1998