Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/11/1998