There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Iraq Liberation Act of 1998

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Iraq Liberation Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

Iraq Liberation Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program to support a transition to democracy in Iraq.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-338. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998Presented to President.
10/07/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11811-11812)
10/05/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 360 - 38 (Roll No. 482).
09/29/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-338. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998HousePresented to President.
10/08/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1998SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11811-11812)
10/06/1998SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/05/1998-7:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/05/1998-7:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 360 - 38 (Roll No. 482).
10/05/1998-7:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
10/05/1998-6:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/05/1998-6:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/05/1998-6:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9486-9494)
10/05/1998-6:12pmHouseMr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/02/1998HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/02/1998HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
10/01/1998HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1857)
09/29/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
09/29/1998HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/29/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House International Relations09/29/1998 Referred to
10/02/1998 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/05/1998)

Iraq Liberation Act of 1998 - Declares that it should be the policy of the United States to seek to remove the Saddam Hussein regime from power in Iraq and to replace it with a democratic government.

Authorizes the President, after notifying specified congressional committees, to provide to the Iraqi democratic opposition organizations: (1) grant assistance for radio and television broadcasting to Iraq; (2) Department of Defense (DOD) defense articles and services and military education and training (IMET); and (3) humanitarian assistance, with emphasis on addressing the needs of individuals who have fled from areas under the control of the Hussein regime. Prohibits assistance to any group or organization that is engaged in military cooperation with the Hussein regime. Authorizes appropriations.

Directs the President to designate: (1) one or more Iraqi democratic opposition organizations that meet specified criteria as eligible to receive assistance under this Act; and (2) additional such organizations which satisfy the President's criteria.

Urges the President to call upon the United Nations to establish an international criminal tribunal for the purpose of indicting, prosecuting, and imprisoning Saddam Hussein and other Iraqi officials who are responsible for crimes against humanity, genocide, and other criminal violations of international law.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that once the Saddam Hussein regime is removed from power in Iraq, the United States should support Iraq's transition to democracy by providing humanitarian assistance to the Iraqi people and democracy transition assistance to Iraqi parties and movements with democratic goals, including convening Iraq's foreign creditors to develop a multilateral response to the foreign debt incurred by the Hussein regime.