Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/02/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/02/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/05/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/05/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/06/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/09/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/09/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/10/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/10/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/12/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/13/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/13/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/15/1998