Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/21/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/12/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/12/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/12/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/10/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/20/1997