Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/04/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/05/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/12/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/12/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/12/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/25/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/25/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/25/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/04/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/04/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/19/1997