Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/21/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/21/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/04/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/04/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/06/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/06/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/06/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/06/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 02/11/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/11/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/18/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/30/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/21/1997
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/19/1998