Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/26/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/05/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/13/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/20/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/24/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/18/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/09/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/09/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/08/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/12/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/18/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/05/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/01/1998