Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/04/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/04/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/04/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/04/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/21/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/21/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/26/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/26/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/26/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/23/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/20/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/04/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/04/1998