Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/05/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/05/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/10/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/16/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/14/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/16/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/10/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/28/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/28/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/22/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/16/1998