There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States courthouse located at 500 Pearl Street in New York City, New York, as the "Ted Weiss United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/13/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to without objection.
07/31/1997Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 105-234.
02/04/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/27/1998SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10943-10944)
09/29/1997-2:12pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Crapo objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/29/1997-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/29/1997-2:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8091-8092)
09/29/1997-2:09pmHouseMr. Kim moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/31/1997HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
07/31/1997HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 105-234.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/23/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/23/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/22/1997HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development
07/22/1997HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development
02/18/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/04/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/04/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/26/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/26/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/26/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/26/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/26/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/06/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/06/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/06/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/13/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/13/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/13/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/04/1997 Referred to
07/23/1997 Markup by
07/31/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-234
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development02/18/1997 Referred to
07/22/1997 Markup by
07/22/1997 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works01/27/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.548.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.548. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/1997)

Designates the Federal building located at 500 Pearl Street in New York City, New York, as the Ted Weiss United States Courthouse.