There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

Population Planning bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Family Planning Facilitation and Abortion Funding Restriction Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Family Planning Facilitation and Abortion Funding Restriction Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend Public Law 104-208 to provide that the President may make funds appropriated for population planning and other population assistance available on March 1, 1997, subject to restrictions on assistance to foreign organizations that perform or actively promote abortions.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/13/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 194 (Roll no. 23).
02/04/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
02/24/1997SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 18.
02/13/1997SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
02/13/1997-3:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/1997-3:05pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 194 (Roll no. 23).
02/13/1997-2:42pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/13/1997-1:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
02/13/1997-1:35pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 581 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
02/13/1997-1:35pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 46. (consideration: CR H555-564)
02/13/1997-1:34pmHouseRule H. Res. 46 passed House.
02/11/1997-4:56pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 46 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 581 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
02/04/1997HouseReferred to House Appropriations
02/04/1997HouseReferred to House International Relations
02/04/1997HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/04/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/04/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/04/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/04/1997 Referred to
House Appropriations02/04/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/1997)

Family Planning Facilitation and Abortion Funding Restriction Act of 1997 - Amends the Omnibus Consolidated Appropriations Act, 1997 to authorize the President to make certain population planning assistance to developing countries available on March 1, 1997 (currently, July 1, 1997).

Prohibits the availability of appropriated funds for population activities to any private, nongovernmental, or multilateral organization until it certifies that it does not now and will not during the period for which funds are made available: (1) directly or through a subcontractor or subgrantee perform abortions in any foreign country, except if the life of the mother would be endangered if the fetus were carried to term or in cases of forcible rape or incest; or (2) violate the laws of a foreign country with respect to the circumstances under which abortion is permitted, regulated, or prohibited, or engage in lobbying activities in an effort to alter its laws with respect to abortion (except lobbying in opposition to coercive abortion or involuntary sterilization).