Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/21/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/21/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/12/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/05/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/05/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/05/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/05/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/05/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/10/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/10/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/13/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/13/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/30/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/22/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/07/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/27/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/03/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/03/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/03/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/12/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/03/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/03/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/23/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/14/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/08/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew