Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/16/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/16/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/16/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/16/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/11/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/11/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/11/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/05/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/05/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/05/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/24/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/09/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/1998