Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/10/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/10/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/13/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/13/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/25/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/25/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/06/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew