Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/27/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/05/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/11/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/11/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/11/1997