Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/27/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/27/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/27/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/27/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/27/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/27/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/20/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/20/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/10/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/10/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/10/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/10/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/08/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/15/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/05/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/05/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/05/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/19/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/19/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/19/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/19/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/30/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/30/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/08/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/03/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/11/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/23/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/23/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/14/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/22/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/11/1998