Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/11/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/11/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/11/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/11/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/11/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/26/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/26/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/26/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/04/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/04/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/12/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/12/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/12/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/12/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/13/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/20/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/10/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/19/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/14/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/05/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/13/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/05/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/05/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/05/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/12/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/12/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/25/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/25/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/05/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/12/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/12/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/12/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/24/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/01/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/28/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/28/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/28/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/28/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/21/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/06/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/06/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/10/1998