Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/13/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/13/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/13/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/08/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/23/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/22/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/30/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/14/1998