Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/12/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/29/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/29/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/29/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/29/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/29/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/13/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/03/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/03/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/08/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/23/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/23/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/23/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/23/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/23/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/23/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/23/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/23/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/23/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/07/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/07/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/07/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/18/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/09/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/20/1998