There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Declaration of Official Language Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 4, United States Code, to declare English as the official language of the Government of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/05/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/05/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/21/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/05/1997Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/1997Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/1997Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/05/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/12/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/12/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/26/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/26/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/26/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/19/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/20/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/19/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/04/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/04/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce02/05/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families02/21/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary02/05/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/05/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.622.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.622. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/05/1997)

Declaration of Official Language Act of 1997 - Declares English to be the official language of the U.S. Government. States that English is the preferred language of communication among U.S. citizens. Requires the U.S. Government to promote and support the use of English for communications among U.S. citizens. Requires communications by officers and employees of the U.S. Government with U.S. citizens to be in English.

Directs the Immigration and Naturalization Service to: (1) enforce the established English language proficiency standard for all applicants for U.S. citizenship; and (2) conduct all naturalization ceremonies entirely in English.

Allows anyone injured by a violation of such provisions to obtain appropriate relief in a civil action. Authorizes the court in any such action to allow a prevailing party, other than the U.S. Government, a reasonable attorney's fee as part of costs.

Repeals the Bilingual Education Act (title VII of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965).

Amends the Voting Rights Act of 1965 to repeal bilingual voting requirements.