Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/12/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/12/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/26/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/26/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/26/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/19/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/20/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/19/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/04/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/04/1997