Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/10/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/25/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/25/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/25/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 07/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/23/1997