Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/20/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/03/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/03/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/05/1998