Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/06/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/13/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/10/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/23/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/06/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/28/1998