Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/10/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/10/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/10/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/10/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/12/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/12/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/12/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/06/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/06/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/06/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/06/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/12/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/17/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/17/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/17/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/17/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/19/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/19/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/19/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/30/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/16/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/04/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/04/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/19/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/19/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/19/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/19/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/24/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/16/1997