Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/05/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/05/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/12/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/12/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/12/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/12/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/21/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/21/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/21/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/15/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/15/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/1997