Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/12/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/12/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/12/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/27/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/27/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/03/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/17/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/17/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/24/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/29/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/14/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/14/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/22/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/21/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/21/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/31/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew