There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to limit the penalty for late enrollment under the Medicare Program to 10 percent and twice the period of no enrollment.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
02/13/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/11/1997Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/25/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/25/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/22/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/22/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/11/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/28/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/28/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/19/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/07/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce02/11/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/14/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/11/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/13/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.676.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/1997)

Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to limit the late enrollment penalty to a ten percent increase in the monthly part B premium due over a period equal to twice the number of years that the part B beneficiary could have been but was not enrolled under part B.